THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:46:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nairobi School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Nairobi School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nairobi School of Medicine, 2012
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Dec 2024 to 31 Dec 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Nov 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
25 Aug 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Ottawa
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2022 to 24 Aug 2022
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Dec 2024 to 31 Dec 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Nov 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 25 Aug 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 24 Aug 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022