THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:19:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Federal do Rio de Janeiro (UFRJ) Faculdade de Medicina, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidade Federal do Rio de Janeiro (UFRJ) Faculdade de Medicina, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Federal do Rio de Janeiro (UFRJ) Faculdade de Medicina, 2009
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2024 to 02 Aug 2024
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
11 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2023 to 10 Mar 2024
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
08 Apr 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Ottawa
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
11 Mar 2022 to 07 Apr 2022
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 02 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 11 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 10 Mar 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 08 Apr 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Cardiology
DATE: 11 Mar 2022 to 07 Apr 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Aug 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2022
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2022