THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:29:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave E
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Division of Urology
Mary Grace Wing, 3rd Floor
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 33380
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave E
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Division of Urology
Mary Grace Wing, 3rd Floor
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 33380
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUTLAQ H M H KH TH ALSAHLI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALSAHLI is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. ALSAHLI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALSAHLI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALSAHLI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALSAHLI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALSAHLI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUTLAQ H M H KH TH ALSAHLI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALSAHLI is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. ALSAHLI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALSAHLI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALSAHLI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALSAHLI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALSAHLI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
26 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
01 Jul 2025 to 25 Aug 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
26 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
01 Jul 2024 to 25 Aug 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
26 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
01 Jul 2023 to 25 Aug 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
PEAP - R - Urology
12 May 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
DATE: 26 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 25 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
DATE: 26 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 25 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
DATE: 26 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 25 Aug 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Urology
DATE: 12 May 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 May 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 May 2022