THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:52:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 596-4200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 596-4200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NASER A M A A ALFODARI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALFODARI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ALFODARI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALFODARI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALFODARI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALFODARI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALFODARI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NASER A M A A ALFODARI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALFODARI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ALFODARI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALFODARI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALFODARI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALFODARI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALFODARI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
01 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jul 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
01 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jul 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
01 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
01 Aug 2023 to 31 Aug 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2023 to 31 Jul 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
01 Aug 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PEAP - R - Psychiatry
10 Jun 2022 to 31 Jul 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Aug 2023 to 31 Aug 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 31 Jul 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Aug 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Psychiatry
DATE: 10 Jun 2022 to 31 Jul 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 2022