THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:16:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Avenue
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Sinai Health System Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Avenue
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Sinai Health System Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH AYMAN SHAMIYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMIYA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH AYMAN SHAMIYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMIYA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Apr 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Dec 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Mar 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2022