THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:45:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Walter Sisulu University Faculty of Health Sciences, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 849 Upper Wentworth St
Wentworth Limeridge Medical Centre
Back2Play Pediatrics
Suite 202
Hamilton ON L9A 5H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-389-2929
Fax: 289-919-3195

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 28 Oct 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Walter Sisulu University Faculty of Health Sciences, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 849 Upper Wentworth St
Wentworth Limeridge Medical Centre
Back2Play Pediatrics
Suite 202
Hamilton ON L9A 5H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-389-2929
Fax: 289-919-3195

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 28 Oct 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
28 Oct 2022
27 Oct 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 28 2022
EXPIRY DATE: Oct 27 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. KUMARAN MOODLEY may practise pediatrics at 849 Upper Wentworth Street in Hamilton, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MOODLEY’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. MOODLEY’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. MOODLEY’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 28 October, 2022, and will expire on or before 27 October, 2025, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. KUMARAN MOODLEY may practise pediatrics at 849 Upper Wentworth Street in Hamilton, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MOODLEY’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. MOODLEY’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. MOODLEY’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 28 October, 2022, and will expire on or before 27 October, 2025, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Walter Sisulu University Faculty of Health Sciences, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2022
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 27 Oct 2025