Medical School:
UFR de Médecine de Paris Centre, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Radiology |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Radiology |
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Radiology |
26 Mar 2023 to 30 Jun 2023 |
University of Toronto |
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Radiology |
01 Jan 2023 to 25 Mar 2023 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Radiology
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Radiology
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Radiology
DATE:
26 Mar 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Radiology
DATE:
01 Jan 2023 to 25 Mar 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto