THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:01:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 93 Rue Saint-Michael
Châteauguay QC J6K 1Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 93 Rue Saint-Michael
Châteauguay QC J6K 1Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HESHAM HAZEM M ALGHOFILI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALGHOFILI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ALGHOFILI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALGHOFILI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALGHOFILI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALGHOFILI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALGHOFILI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HESHAM HAZEM M ALGHOFILI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALGHOFILI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ALGHOFILI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALGHOFILI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALGHOFILI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALGHOFILI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALGHOFILI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Vascular Surgery
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Vascular Surgery
25 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PEAP - R - Vascular Surgery
02 May 2022 to 24 Jul 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Vascular Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Vascular Surgery
DATE: 25 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Vascular Surgery
DATE: 02 May 2022 to 24 Jul 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2022