Medical School:
King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology |
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology |
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
PEAP - R - Diagnostic Radiology |
11 Apr 2023 to 30 Jun 2023 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - R - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE:
11 Apr 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto