THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:32:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: Nayan, Priyanka (Used Until: 19 Mar 2022)
Medical School: Cardiff University School of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1967 Riverside Dr
room 6-33, box 37
The Ottawa Hospitals
Riverside campus
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 17 Mar 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 17 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: Nayan, Priyanka (Used Until: 19 Mar 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI, URDU
Medical School: Cardiff University School of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1967 Riverside Dr
room 6-33, box 37
The Ottawa Hospitals
Riverside campus
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 17 Mar 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 17 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Jun 2023
28 Feb 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 15 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Feb 28 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. PRIYANKA CHANDRATRE may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Rheumatology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. CHANDRATRE holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. CHANDRATRE no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. CHANDRATRE’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. CHANDRATRE’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 17 March, 2023, and expires on 28 February, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. CHANDRATRE's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. PRIYANKA CHANDRATRE may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Rheumatology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. CHANDRATRE holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. CHANDRATRE no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. CHANDRATRE’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. CHANDRATRE’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 17 March, 2023, and expires on 28 February, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. CHANDRATRE's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cardiff University School of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 28 Feb 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 28 Feb 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2023