Medical School:
Bar-Ilan University Faculty of Medicine in the Galilee, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine |
01 Jul 2025 to 02 Jan 2026 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine |
01 Feb 2025 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine |
02 Aug 2024 to 31 Jan 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine |
01 Jul 2024 to 01 Aug 2024 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine |
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine |
24 Oct 2022 to 30 Jun 2023 |
University of Toronto |
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine |
01 Aug 2022 to 23 Oct 2022 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 02 Jan 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
01 Feb 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
02 Aug 2024 to 31 Jan 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 01 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
24 Oct 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
01 Aug 2022 to 23 Oct 2022
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto