THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:23:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Danylo Halytsky Lviv National Medical University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Danylo Halytsky Lviv National Medical University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Danylo Halytsky Lviv National Medical University, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
14 Jul 2024 to 07 Dec 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 13 Jul 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
10 Oct 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
18 Jul 2022 to 09 Oct 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 14 Jul 2024 to 07 Dec 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 13 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 10 Oct 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 18 Jul 2022 to 09 Oct 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Dec 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Dec 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2022