THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:23:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Ave
Princess Margaret Cancer Center
Gerry & Nancy Pencer Brain Tumour Centre
18th Floor
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 21 Nov 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Ave
Princess Margaret Cancer Center
Gerry & Nancy Pencer Brain Tumour Centre
18th Floor
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 21 Nov 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROA TALAL A ALSAJJAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSAJJAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROA TALAL A ALSAJJAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSAJJAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2025
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2022