THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:36:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nottingham School of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Ave
The Hospital for Sick Children
Anesthesiology
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 813 1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Nottingham School of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Ave
The Hospital for Sick Children
Anesthesiology
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 813 1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEMMA CAROLINE DIGNAM may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. DIGNAM is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. DIGNAM shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DIGNAM is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DIGNAM shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. DIGNAM ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. DIGNAM ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEMMA CAROLINE DIGNAM may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. DIGNAM is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. DIGNAM shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DIGNAM is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DIGNAM shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. DIGNAM ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. DIGNAM ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nottingham School of Medicine, 2005
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
27 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2024 to 26 Jul 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2023 to 31 Dec 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
09 Aug 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2022 to 08 Aug 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 27 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 26 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 31 Dec 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 09 Aug 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 08 Aug 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022