THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:33:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alfaisal University College of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 3658884228
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Alfaisal University College of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 3658884228
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARES TOFAILAHMED RAJAH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. RAJAH is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. RAJAH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. RAJAH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. RAJAH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. RAJAH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. RAJAH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2023.
(1) Dr. FARES TOFAILAHMED RAJAH may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. RAJAH is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. RAJAH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. RAJAH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. RAJAH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. RAJAH ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. RAJAH ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARES TOFAILAHMED RAJAH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. RAJAH is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. RAJAH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. RAJAH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. RAJAH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. RAJAH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. RAJAH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2023.
(1) Dr. FARES TOFAILAHMED RAJAH may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. RAJAH is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. RAJAH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. RAJAH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. RAJAH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. RAJAH ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. RAJAH ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alfaisal University College of Medicine, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
08 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2024 to 07 Jul 2024
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
08 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2023 to 07 Jul 2023
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
08 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
08 Jun 2022 to 07 Jul 2022
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 08 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 07 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 08 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 07 Jul 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 08 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Cardiology
DATE: 08 Jun 2022 to 07 Jul 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2022