THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:32:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Nacional de Córdoba Facultad de Ciencias Médicas, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidad Nacional de Córdoba Facultad de Ciencias Médicas, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA LUZ GARAGIOLA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. GARAGIOLA is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. GARAGIOLA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GARAGIOLA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. GARAGIOLA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. GARAGIOLA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. GARAGIOLA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA LUZ GARAGIOLA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. GARAGIOLA is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. GARAGIOLA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GARAGIOLA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. GARAGIOLA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. GARAGIOLA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. GARAGIOLA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Nacional de Córdoba Facultad de Ciencias Médicas, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
23 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
01 Jul 2022 to 22 Sep 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 23 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 22 Sep 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022