THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 07:15:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Balamand Faculty of Medicine and Medical Sciences, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Balamand Faculty of Medicine and Medical Sciences, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Balamand Faculty of Medicine and Medical Sciences, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Dec 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
23 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2022 to 22 Sep 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Dec 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 23 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 22 Sep 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2024
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2024

DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022