THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:11:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Qassim University College of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Qassim University College of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Qassim University College of Medicine, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Adult Thrombosis Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Adult Thrombosis Medicine
26 Aug 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Ottawa
PEAP - CF - Adult Thrombosis Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 25 Aug 2022
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Adult Thrombosis Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Adult Thrombosis Medicine
DATE: 26 Aug 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Adult Thrombosis Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 25 Aug 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022