THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:44:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Chandka Medical College, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, SINDHI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Arab Emirates

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, SINDHI, URDU
Medical School: Chandka Medical College, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Arab Emirates

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Chandka Medical College, 2002
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jul 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
31 Jul 2023 to 31 Jul 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jul 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
24 Oct 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Aug 2022 to 23 Oct 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 31 Jul 2023 to 31 Jul 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jul 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 24 Oct 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Aug 2022 to 23 Oct 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2022