THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 03:12:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MING YIN KOO shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KOO is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. KOO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KOO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KOO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KOO is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KOO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MING YIN KOO shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KOO is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. KOO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KOO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KOO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KOO is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KOO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
01 Sep 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
EL - Hematology
02 Aug 2022 to 29 Aug 2022
University of Ottawa
EL - Hematology
04 May 2022 to 31 May 2022
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 01 Sep 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: EL - Hematology
DATE: 02 Aug 2022 to 29 Aug 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: EL - Hematology
DATE: 04 May 2022 to 31 May 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Aug 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 2022