THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:01:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Orlèans Family Health Clinic
210 Centrum Blvd
Suite 101 & 110
Orléans ON K1E 3V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Oct 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Orlèans Family Health Clinic
210 Centrum Blvd
Suite 101 & 110
Orléans ON K1E 3V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Oct 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAN OLAF DOMINIK JABLONSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JABLONSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAN OLAF DOMINIK JABLONSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JABLONSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Sep 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2022