THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:59:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the East/Ramon Magsaysay Memorial Medical Center College of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
UHN Memory Clinic, Division of Neurology
West Wing - 5th Floor
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-5232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the East/Ramon Magsaysay Memorial Medical Center College of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
UHN Memory Clinic, Division of Neurology
West Wing - 5th Floor
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-5232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICO PAULO MANIAGO DIMAL may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. DIMAL is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. DIMAL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DIMAL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DIMAL shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. DIMAL ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. DIMAL ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICO PAULO MANIAGO DIMAL may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. DIMAL is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. DIMAL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DIMAL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DIMAL shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. DIMAL ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. DIMAL ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the East/Ramon Magsaysay Memorial Medical Center College of Medicine, 2014
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
23 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Neurology
01 Jul 2022 to 22 Sep 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 23 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 22 Sep 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022