THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 05:29:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 500 University Ave
Suite #602
Toronto ON M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 500 University Ave
Suite #602
Toronto ON M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATASHA ERIN LANE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LANE is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. LANE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LANE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. LANE shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. LANE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. LANE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 22 August, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATASHA ERIN LANE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LANE is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. LANE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LANE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. LANE shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. LANE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. LANE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 22 August, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 22 Aug 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
16 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 15 Sep 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
EL - Geriatric Medicine
06 Jun 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 22 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
DATE: 16 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 15 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Geriatric Medicine
DATE: 06 Jun 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 22 Aug 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 22 Aug 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2022