THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:14:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Católica de Pelotas (UCPEL) Faculdade de Medicina, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst St
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anesthesia and Pain Management
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidade Católica de Pelotas (UCPEL) Faculdade de Medicina, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst St
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anesthesia and Pain Management
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAMIRIS CRISTINA SOARES may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SOARES is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. SOARES shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SOARES is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SOARES shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. SOARES ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. SOARES ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 December, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAMIRIS CRISTINA SOARES may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SOARES is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. SOARES shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SOARES is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SOARES shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. SOARES ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. SOARES ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 December, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Católica de Pelotas (UCPEL) Faculdade de Medicina, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jan 2025 to 31 Dec 2025
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
02 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2023 to 01 Jul 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
23 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2022 to 22 Sep 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jan 2025 to 31 Dec 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 02 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 01 Jul 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 23 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 22 Sep 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2025
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Apr 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2022