THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:16:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. Luke's Medical Center College of Medicine - William H. Quasha Memorial (SLMCCM-WHQM), 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6049165997
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. Luke's Medical Center College of Medicine - William H. Quasha Memorial (SLMCCM-WHQM), 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6049165997
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRIA EVANGELISTA MATIC may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. MATIC is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. MATIC shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MATIC is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MATIC shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. MATIC ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. MATIC ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRIA EVANGELISTA MATIC may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. MATIC is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. MATIC shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MATIC is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MATIC shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. MATIC ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. MATIC ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. Luke's Medical Center College of Medicine - William H. Quasha Memorial (SLMCCM-WHQM), 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Neurology
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023