THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:33:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine
30 Jun 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
McMaster University
EL - Critical Care Medicine
08 Apr 2025 to 05 May 2025
Western University
EL - Critical Care Medicine
29 Jul 2024 to 25 Aug 2024
Queen's University
EL - Critical Care Medicine
12 Apr 2022 to 09 May 2022
Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 30 Jun 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: EL - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 08 Apr 2025 to 05 May 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: EL - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 29 Jul 2024 to 25 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: EL - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 12 Apr 2022 to 09 May 2022
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 May 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2025
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Aug 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 May 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2022
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 May 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 May 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 2022