THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:07:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Gynecologic Oncology
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-4378
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Oncology
Effective: 09 Sep 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Gynecologic Oncology
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-4378
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Oncology
Effective: 09 Sep 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINA ALYSSA INCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INCE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINA ALYSSA INCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INCE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2022
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2022