THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:12:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
EL - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
08 May 2023 to 04 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
EL - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
16 Jan 2023 to 12 Mar 2023
University of Toronto
EL - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
02 May 2022 to 27 May 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 08 May 2023 to 04 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 16 Jan 2023 to 12 Mar 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 02 May 2022 to 27 May 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 May 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Mar 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 May 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 2022
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 May 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 2022