THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:32:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
01 Jul 2024 to 25 Sep 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
01 Jun 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
01 Jul 2023 to 31 May 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
19 Dec 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
26 Sep 2022 to 18 Dec 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 25 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE: 01 Jun 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 31 May 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE: 19 Dec 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
DATE: 26 Sep 2022 to 18 Dec 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Sep 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2022