THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:25:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: Araújo, Tatianny Paula (Used Until: 17 Mar 2022)
Medical School: Faculdade de Medicina de Petrópolis / Faculdade Arthur Sá Earp Neto (FMP/Fase), 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Araújo, Tatianny Paula (Used Until: 17 Mar 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Faculdade de Medicina de Petrópolis / Faculdade Arthur Sá Earp Neto (FMP/Fase), 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Faculdade de Medicina de Petrópolis / Faculdade Arthur Sá Earp Neto (FMP/Fase), 2010
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
01 Jul 2024 to 29 Aug 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
23 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
01 Jul 2022 to 22 Sep 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 29 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE: 23 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 22 Sep 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Aug 2024
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022