THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:50:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Western University
1151 Richmond St
London ON N6A 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 20 Sep 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Western University
1151 Richmond St
London ON N6A 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 20 Sep 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
05 Dec 2024
30 Jun 2028
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 05 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2028
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. PARUL KUMAR may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Psychiatry, Division of General Adult Psychiatry, Western University, in which Dr. KUMAR holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. KUMAR no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. KUMAR’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. KUMAR’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 20 September, 2022, and expires on 30 June, 2028. Upon renewal of Dr. KUMAR's academic appointment at the Western University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. PARUL KUMAR may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Psychiatry, Division of General Adult Psychiatry, Western University, in which Dr. KUMAR holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. KUMAR no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. KUMAR’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. KUMAR’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 20 September, 2022, and expires on 30 June, 2028. Upon renewal of Dr. KUMAR's academic appointment at the Western University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2028
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2028

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2022