THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:51:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Core Family Health Centre
825 Richmond St
London ON N6A 3H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 128 Patrick St
Laidley QLD Australia 4341
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Apr 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 06 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Core Family Health Centre
825 Richmond St
London ON N6A 3H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 128 Patrick St
Laidley QLD Australia 4341
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Apr 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 06 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL CHRISTOPHER TINGEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TINGEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL CHRISTOPHER TINGEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TINGEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2023
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 06 Feb 2026