THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:42:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 2A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 169 Main Street East
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 2A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 169 Main Street East
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIYATI MOHIT MALKANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALKANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIYATI MOHIT MALKANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALKANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Oct 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Jul 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2022