THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:45:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-281-7446
Fax: 416-281-7082

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 10 Mar 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Nov 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 10 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-281-7446
Fax: 416-281-7082

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 10 Mar 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Nov 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 10 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
10 Mar 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 10 2025
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. DHIVIYAN VALENTINE may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and geriatric medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. DHIVIYAN VALENTINE may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and geriatric medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Mar 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022