Medical School:
Norwich Medical School, University of East Anglia, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology |
18 Apr 2025 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology |
01 Jul 2024 to 17 Apr 2025 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology |
18 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology |
01 Jul 2023 to 17 Apr 2024 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology |
18 Nov 2022 to 30 Jun 2023 |
University of Ottawa |
AVP - Anesthesiology |
13 Jul 2022 to 17 Nov 2022 |
University of Ottawa |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
DATE:
18 Apr 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 17 Apr 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
DATE:
18 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 17 Apr 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
DATE:
18 Nov 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
AVP - Anesthesiology
DATE:
13 Jul 2022 to 17 Nov 2022
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa