THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:06:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Khaja Bandanawaz University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6G 2M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196858500
Extension: 16444
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: Khaja Bandanawaz University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6G 2M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196858500
Extension: 16444
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AIESHA DURREBAR YOUNUS KHAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KHAN is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. KHAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KHAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KHAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KHAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KHAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AIESHA DURREBAR YOUNUS KHAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KHAN is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. KHAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KHAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KHAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KHAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KHAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Khaja Bandanawaz University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
01 Feb 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
01 Jul 2023 to 31 Jan 2024
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
24 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Western University
AVP - Neurology
01 Jul 2022 to 23 Sep 2022
Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Feb 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 31 Jan 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
DATE: 24 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: AVP - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 23 Sep 2022
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022