THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:50:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: Gervais, Julia Ann Theresa (Used Until: 21 Apr 2022)
Medical School: Queen's University, 2022
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Yukon Street
24 Health Services Centre 8 Wing Trenton
Canadian Forces
Quinte West Ontario K8V 3S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613)392-2811
Extension: 4457
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Gervais, Julia Ann Theresa (Used Until: 21 Apr 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Yukon Street
24 Health Services Centre 8 Wing Trenton
Canadian Forces
Quinte West Ontario K8V 3S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613)392-2811
Extension: 4457
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIA ANN THERESA YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIA ANN THERESA YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2022

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022