THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:59:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2022
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 70 Barrie St
Kingston ON K7L 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 70 Barrie St
Kingston ON K7L 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS PETER MOHAN REID shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. REID is enrolled at Queen's University;
(2) Dr. REID shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. REID is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. REID shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. REID is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. REID no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS PETER MOHAN REID shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. REID is enrolled at Queen's University;
(2) Dr. REID shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. REID is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. REID shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. REID is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. REID no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2022
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
23 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Queen's University
AVP - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 22 Sep 2022
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 23 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: AVP - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 22 Sep 2022
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022