THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:33:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2022
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807 737-3030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North of Superior Healthcare Group Marathon
Atikokan Health and Community Services Atikokan
HOSPITAL: North of Superior Healthcare Group
LOCATION: Marathon

HOSPITAL: Atikokan Health and Community Services
LOCATION: Atikokan

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807 737-3030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North of Superior Healthcare Group Marathon
Atikokan Health and Community Services Atikokan
HOSPITAL: North of Superior Healthcare Group
LOCATION: Marathon

HOSPITAL: Atikokan Health and Community Services
LOCATION: Atikokan

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YI QING MA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YI QING MA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2022

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022