THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:55:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: Crawford, Rebecca Zado (Used Until: 24 Apr 2022)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2022
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1105 Kingston Road
West Durham Family Health Team
Building E- Unit 200B
Pickering Ontario L1V 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-420-9999
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: 4164382911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2920 Lawrence Avenue East
Bendale Acres Long Term Care
6th floor
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T8
Phone: 416-397-7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: Crawford, Rebecca Zado (Used Until: 24 Apr 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1105 Kingston Road
West Durham Family Health Team
Building E- Unit 200B
Pickering Ontario L1V 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-420-9999
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: 4164382911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2920 Lawrence Avenue East
Bendale Acres Long Term Care
6th floor
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T8
Phone: 416-397-7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA ZADO CRAWFORD-ARAGONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRAWFORD-ARAGONES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA ZADO CRAWFORD-ARAGONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRAWFORD-ARAGONES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2022

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022