THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 02:20:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2022
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Anesthesiology and Perioperative Medicine
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hospital Court
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Critical Care Medicine
Oshawa Ontario L1G
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Anesthesiology and Perioperative Medicine
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hospital Court
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Critical Care Medicine
Oshawa Ontario L1G
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 May 2025
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 15 2025
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ROBERT TAYLOR shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. TAYLOR is enrolled at Queen's University.

(2) In Dr. TAYLOR’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. TAYLOR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. TAYLOR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

(3) In Dr. TAYLOR’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. TAYLOR shall not charge a fee for medical services.

Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(4) Dr. TAYLOR may practise adult critical care medicine and to the extent of his employment at Lakeridge Health Corporation Oshawa, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(5) In Dr. TAYLOR’s practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. TAYLOR may not charge a fee for medical services.

Expiry of Certificate

(6) This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. TAYLOR must thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education program, on the earlier of the following times:

(a) when Dr. TAYLOR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education program provided by a medical school in Ontario, or

(b) when Dr. TAYLOR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(7) This certificate automatically converts to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate and Dr. TAYLOR must immediately cease all practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of the following occurs:

(a) the supervisor identified in paragraph (4) notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. TAYLOR’s practice, including but not limited to concerns regarding knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude;

(b) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. TAYLOR’s practice;

(c) the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school’s approval for Dr. TAYLOR to engage in practice outside the postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;

(d) when Dr. TAYLOR’s employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or

(e) if Dr. TAYLOR takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another program, from the postgraduate education program specified in paragraph (1).

Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(8) In the event of conversion to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate under paragraph (7) or expiry of the certificate under paragraph (7), Dr. TAYLOR may not resume any practice outside the postgraduate medical education program under the restricted registration for residents policy until Dr. TAYLOR applies for a new certificate of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ROBERT TAYLOR shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. TAYLOR is enrolled at Queen's University.

(2) In Dr. TAYLOR’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. TAYLOR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. TAYLOR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

(3) In Dr. TAYLOR’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. TAYLOR shall not charge a fee for medical services.

Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(4) Dr. TAYLOR may practise adult critical care medicine and to the extent of his employment at Lakeridge Health Corporation Oshawa, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(5) In Dr. TAYLOR’s practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. TAYLOR may not charge a fee for medical services.

Expiry of Certificate

(6) This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. TAYLOR must thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education program, on the earlier of the following times:

(a) when Dr. TAYLOR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education program provided by a medical school in Ontario, or

(b) when Dr. TAYLOR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(7) This certificate automatically converts to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate and Dr. TAYLOR must immediately cease all practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of the following occurs:

(a) the supervisor identified in paragraph (4) notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. TAYLOR’s practice, including but not limited to concerns regarding knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude;

(b) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. TAYLOR’s practice;

(c) the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school’s approval for Dr. TAYLOR to engage in practice outside the postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;

(d) when Dr. TAYLOR’s employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or

(e) if Dr. TAYLOR takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another program, from the postgraduate education program specified in paragraph (1).

Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(8) In the event of conversion to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate under paragraph (7) or expiry of the certificate under paragraph (7), Dr. TAYLOR may not resume any practice outside the postgraduate medical education program under the restricted registration for residents policy until Dr. TAYLOR applies for a new certificate of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2022
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
29 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2025 to 28 Jul 2025
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 29 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 28 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2025
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022