Medical School:
University of Calgary, 2022
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery |
26 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2024 to 25 Aug 2024 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
DATE:
26 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 25 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto