Medical School:
Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery |
01 Nov 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery |
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Oct 2025 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery |
01 Nov 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery |
30 Jul 2024 to 31 Oct 2024 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery |
01 Jul 2024 to 29 Jul 2024 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery |
01 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery |
01 Jul 2023 to 31 Aug 2023 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery |
23 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023 |
University of Toronto |
AVP - Neurosurgery |
01 Jul 2022 to 22 Sep 2022 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
DATE:
01 Nov 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Oct 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
DATE:
01 Nov 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
DATE:
30 Jul 2024 to 31 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 29 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
DATE:
01 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 31 Aug 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
DATE:
23 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
AVP - Neurosurgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 22 Sep 2022
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto