THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 02:57:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: NUI Galway School of Medicine, 2022
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3305 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-632-8007
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: NUI Galway School of Medicine, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3305 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-632-8007
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALBERT WAFIK SABRY ISHAK GURGES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GURGES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALBERT WAFIK SABRY ISHAK GURGES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GURGES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: NUI Galway School of Medicine, 2022

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022