THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:29:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2022
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Western Hospital
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-2581
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Western Hospital
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-2581
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EAGAN JOSEPH PETERS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. PETERS is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. PETERS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PETERS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. PETERS shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. PETERS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. PETERS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EAGAN JOSEPH PETERS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. PETERS is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. PETERS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PETERS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. PETERS shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. PETERS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. PETERS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2022
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
13 Jan 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 12 Jan 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
13 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 12 Jan 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 13 Jan 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 12 Jan 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 13 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 12 Jan 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022