THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:12:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2022
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6 Queen's Park Cres W
3rd Floor Room 319
Toronto ON M5S 3H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-978-6045
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6 Queen's Park Cres W
3rd Floor Room 319
Toronto ON M5S 3H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-978-6045
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE ELIZABETH KELLER shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KELLER is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. KELLER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KELLER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KELLER shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KELLER is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KELLER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE ELIZABETH KELLER shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KELLER is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. KELLER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KELLER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KELLER shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KELLER is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KELLER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2022
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
06 May 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
01 Jul 2025 to 05 May 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
06 May 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
01 Jul 2024 to 05 May 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
DATE: 06 May 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 05 May 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
DATE: 06 May 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 05 May 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022