Medical School:
Queen's University, 2022
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery |
29 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
Queen's University |
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2025 to 28 Jul 2025 |
Queen's University |
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery |
24 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
Queen's University |
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery |
27 Aug 2024 to 23 Sep 2024 |
Queen's University |
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2024 to 26 Aug 2024 |
Queen's University |
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
Queen's University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023 |
Queen's University |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
DATE:
29 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 28 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
DATE:
24 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
DATE:
27 Aug 2024 to 23 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 26 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University