THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:56:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: Peters, Jocelynn Lee (Used Until: 25 Apr 2022)
Medical School: Western University, 2022
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-4130 Glenview Rd
Petrolia ON N0N 1R0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Peters, Jocelynn Lee (Used Until: 25 Apr 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Western University, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-4130 Glenview Rd
Petrolia ON N0N 1R0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOCELYNN LEE DE KONING shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. DE KONING is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. DE KONING shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DE KONING is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DE KONING shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. DE KONING is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. DE KONING no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 4 May, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOCELYNN LEE DE KONING shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. DE KONING is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. DE KONING shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DE KONING is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DE KONING shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. DE KONING is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. DE KONING no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 4 May, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Western University, 2022
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
20 Feb 2026 to 04 May 2026
Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 19 Feb 2026
Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
06 May 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 05 May 2025
Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
07 May 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
02 Jan 2024 to 06 May 2024
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 01 Jan 2024
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 20 Feb 2026 to 04 May 2026
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 19 Feb 2026
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 06 May 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 05 May 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 07 May 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 02 Jan 2024 to 06 May 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 01 Jan 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 04 May 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 04 May 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022