THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:37:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2022
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN BAILEY DAVIES shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. DAVIES is enrolled at Northern Ontario School of Medicine;
(2) Dr. DAVIES shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DAVIES is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DAVIES shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. DAVIES is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. DAVIES no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN BAILEY DAVIES shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. DAVIES is enrolled at Northern Ontario School of Medicine;
(2) Dr. DAVIES shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DAVIES is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DAVIES shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. DAVIES is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. DAVIES no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2022
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
26 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 25 Aug 2024
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
28 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 27 Aug 2023
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 26 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 25 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 28 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 27 Aug 2023
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2022