Medical School:
University of the West Indies Faculty of Medicine St. Augustine, Trinidad, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
01 Jul 2025 to 17 Nov 2025 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
22 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2024 to 21 Oct 2024 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine |
24 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023 |
Western University |
AVP - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2022 to 23 Sep 2022 |
Western University |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 17 Nov 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
DATE:
22 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 21 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE:
24 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
AVP - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 23 Sep 2022
UNIVERSITY:
Western University